FL H0901 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for medical & personal identifying information of applicant for or recipient of property tax exemption for totally & permanently disabled persons; authorizes disclosure under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Property Tax Exemption for Totally and Permanently Disabled Persons
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | Sen. Jim Boyd [R] | Rep. Julio Gonzalez [R] | Rep. Larry Lee [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Peters [R] | Rep. Patrick Rooney [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-12-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0914 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/901 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0901/BillText/Filed/PDF |