FL S0914 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 275 (Ch. 2015-171)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 275 (Ch. 2015-171)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "intermediary" for purposes of the Florida Securities and Investor Protection Act; exempting offers or sales of securities by certain issuers from registration requirements; exempting the intrastate offering and sale of certain securities from certain regulatory requirements; providing registration requirements for an intermediary; requiring an intermediary to comply with specified recordkeeping requirements; including an intermediary in the disciplinary provisions, etc.
Title
Intrastate Crowdfunding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 275 (Ch. 2015-171) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 275 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/15, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/14/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/31/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0275 (Similar To) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-171
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
517 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |