FL S0912 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the committee adjunct to the Department of State for specified purposes; specifying the membership of the committee; requiring each state agency to designate a census coordinator, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Complete Count Committee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H731 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback