FL H0731 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates committee adjunct to DOS for specified purposes; specifies membership of committee; provides for appointment of members & filling of vacancies; prescribing duties of committee & department; requires each state agency to designate census coordinator; prescribing reporting requirements; provides for expiration of act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Complete Count Committee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S912 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20052Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback