FL S0910 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to authorize the living spouse of a deceased veteran, who upon his or her death was aged 65 or older, partially or totally permanently disabled due to combat, and honorably discharged, to receive a discount on the payment of ad valorem taxes on homestead property based on the percentage of the veteran's disability and to specify that the exemption is transferrable to another residence if the spouse remains unmarried and uses the residence as his or her primary residence, etc.
Title
Homestead Exemption/Living Spouse of Deceased Combat-Disabled Veteran
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0299 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/910 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0910/BillText/Filed/HTML |