FL S0910 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Safe and Hygienic Bedding Act." Prohibits a person from manufacturing or selling bedding that is made in whole or in part from secondhand material unless such material has been sanitized, germicidally treated, or cleaned using a method approved by the DOACS. Requires that all bedding manufactured, renovated, sanitized, or sold in this state which contains secondhand materials bear a clear and conspicuous label affixed to the bedding which contains specified information, etc.
Title
Bedding Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 70 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 70 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1219 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/910 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0910/BillText/Filed/HTML |