FL H1219 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act as "Safe and Hygienic Bedding Act"; prohibits person from manufacturing or selling bedding made from secondhand material unless such material is sanitized, germicidally treated, or cleaned; requires bedding manufactured, renovated, sanitized, or sold in this state which contains secondhand materials to bear label containing specified information; prohibits removing, defacing, or altering label; prohibits false or misleading statement on label, etc.
Title
Bedding Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 220 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 107 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1219 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1219/BillText/Filed/HTML |