FL S0900 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the operator of a public lodging or food establishment from refusing accommodations to, or removing, a person based solely upon such person's age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Lodging and Food Establishments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Regulated Industries
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-12-03SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
2015-11-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0637 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509142Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback