FL H0637 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions to prohibit operators of public lodging establishments from refusing accommodations to persons based solely upon their age.
Title
Public Lodging Establishments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-15 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 01/12/16, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-11-17 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0900 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |