FL S0894 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 935
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 935
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "business purpose loan"; defining the term "hold himself or herself out to the public as being in the mortgage lending business"; prohibiting the misrepresentation of a residential mortgage loan as a business purpose loan, etc.
Title
Mortgage Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 935 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 935 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S282 (Similar To) 2017-09-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H935 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-61
H935 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-61
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
494 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |