FL S0874 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from allowing a party to take place if a minor is in possession of or consuming alcohol or drugs; revising an exemption; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Open Parties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#390 (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2013-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Refused to concur, requested House to recede |
2013-05-01 | Senate | In returning messages |
2013-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 8 |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (454625) |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 5 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Received |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/13, 12:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/07/13, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0005 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table