FL S0864 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing hospitals, emergency medical services stations, and fire stations to use newborn safety devices to accept surrendered newborn infants under certain circumstances; requiring such hospital, emergency medical services station, or fire station to visually check and test the device within specified timeframes; providing additional locations under which the prohibition on the initiation of criminal investigations based solely on the surrendering of a newborn infant applies, etc.
Title
Surrendered Newborn Infants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1217 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 0423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |