FL S0860 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising eligibility requirements for the examination for certification as a building code inspector or plans examiner to include an internship certification program; authorizing specified entities to contract for the provision of building code administrator and building official services, etc.
Title
Building Code Administrators and Inspectors
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/01/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/28/17, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Regulated Industries; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/14/17, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0909 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H901 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
S7000 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1312 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S802 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
H901 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
S7000 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1312 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S802 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |