FL H0909 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises eligibility requirements for examination for certification as building code inspector or plans examiner to include internship certification program; removes eligibility condition from provisions related to provisional certificates; requires Florida Building Code Administrators & Inspectors Board to establish rules; authorizes specified entities to contract for provision of building code administrator & building official services.
Title
Building Code Administrators and Inspectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#153 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0860 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S802 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
S802 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
S1372 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
H1021 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-149
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
468 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 617 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 8313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
471 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |