FL S0854 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a full-time, part-time, or auxiliary correctional officer to be employed at 18 years of age; prohibiting a correctional officer who is under 19 years of age from supervising inmates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H365 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Now in Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback