FL S0850 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 421 (Ch. 2017-104)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 421 (Ch. 2017-104)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain business entities to join, solely for a specified purpose, self-insurance funds participated in by public housing authorities who hold ownership interests in or who participate in governing such entities; authorizing reinsurance companies to issue coverage directly to certain self-insuring entities organized by a public housing authority under certain circumstances; requiring that reinsurance contracts issued to such entities receive the same tax treatment as contracts issued to insurance companies, etc.
Title
Public Housing Authority Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 421 (Ch. 2017-104) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 421 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/27/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0421 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-104