FL H0421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain entities to join self-insurance funds participated in by public housing authorities for specified purpose; authorizes reinsurance companies to issue coverage directly to certain entities; requires contracts issued to such entities to receive same tax treatment as contracts issued to insurance companies.
Title
Public Housing Authority Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Chapter No. 2017-104 | |
2017-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 850 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-29 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/29/17, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-15 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0850 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 421 (Ch. 2017-104)