FL S0848 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the number of days' notice an excavator must provide to the free-access notification system before beginning any excavation or demolition; creating an underground facility damage prevention review panel; providing a hearing process to allow the review panel to hear complaints regarding certain alleged violations; authorizing member operators to place permanent markers for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Underground Facility Damage Prevention and Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H263 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
556 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/848 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/848/BillText/Filed/HTML |