FL H0263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes number of days notice an excavator must provide to free-access notification system before beginning any excavation or demolition; creates underground facility damage prevention review panel; provides membership, term limits, & duties of review panel; specifies civil penalties which review panel may assess; provides review process through DOAH for infractions not resolved by review panel; provides penalty for person who removes or damages permanent underground facility markers; authorizes member operators to place permanent markers for certain purposes.
Title
Underground Facility Damage Prevention and Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S848 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
556 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/263 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/263/BillText/Filed/PDF |