FL S0846 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the applicability of certain provisions of the Code of Ethics for Public Officers and Employees to members of the executive council of the Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation; requiring elected municipal officers to participate in annual ethics training; prohibiting a person from lobbying a water management district before registering; specifying the applicability of certain provisions of the Code of Ethics for Public Officers and Employees to the president, senior managers, and members of the board of directors of Enterprise Florida, Inc., etc.
Title
Governmental Ethics
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Ethics and Elections Committee | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#867 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#867 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-183 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (957295) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | In returning messages |
2014-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (483745) |
2014-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Received |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-21 | House | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2014-04-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/21/14, 10:45 am, Morris Hall |
2014-04-20 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (418036) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (309078, 631004, 637996, 727518) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/13/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0655 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0606 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
H7155 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
H0353 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0606 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
H7155 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
H0353 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
S0772 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 218 (Ch. 2014-169), CS/CS/SB 230 (Ch. 2014-171), CS/CS/CS/SB 846 (Ch. 2014-183)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 32155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
331 | 3081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |