FL S0842 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the governing authority of each specified county to levy a discretionary surtax on documents for the purpose of establishing and financing an Affordable Housing Trust Fund; specifying a limit on the surtax; specifying procedures and requirements for approval of the surtax by referendum; requiring the county, if levying the surtax, to enact an ordinance creating the trust fund and a housing assistance program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Funding for Affordable Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Community Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
201031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback