FL H0729 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain counties to levy discretionary surtax to finance affordable housing trust fund; specifies cap; specifies documents to which surtax applies; specifies conditions under which surtax may levied; specifies procedures county must use before levying surtax; specifies authorized & prohibited uses of surtax proceeds; prohibits rehabilitation of housing owned by certain governments without vote; authorizes certain counties to create housing assistance voucher programs; specifies uses of vouchers & requirements for programs; requires OPPAGA to review program at specified interval & provide report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Affordable Housing Discretionary Surtax
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S842 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/729 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/729/BillText/Filed/PDF |