FL S0832 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the collection and sharing of data between multiple agencies for the interagency cooperative agreement under the Employment First Act; requiring the Office of Reimagining Education and Career Help to issue an annual statewide report by a specified date each year, etc.
Title
Employment of Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#833 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Chapter No. 2024-60 | |
2024-04-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1137 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table