FL S0810 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring permits to be issued to persons or corporations whose officers are not less than 21 years of age; specifying that fees for a retail tobacco products dealer permit only apply to retailers dealing in certain tobacco products; revising prohibitions on the sale of tobacco products from vending machines; prohibiting a person from selling, delivering, bartering, furnishing, or giving flavored liquid nicotine products to any other person, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Tobacco Products and Nicotine Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#704 (Y: 99 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 9
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (930591)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 99 NAYS 17
2020-03-11HouseAmendment(s) adopted (738731, 822483)
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 4
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-05SenateAmendment(s) adopted (249700, 962572)
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-02-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-21SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-20SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 3
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-06SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-23SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2020-01-23SenateRemaining references corrected to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2020-01-23SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2020-01-22SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-21SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-11-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H151 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S694 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S1394 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H7089 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 810 passed
S1638 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
386212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
569101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
877112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/Amendment/155716/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/Vote/SenateVote_s00810e1032.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/Vote/HouseVote_s00810e1704.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/810/Vote/SenateVote_s00810e1041.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback