FL S1394 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring all applications for retail tobacco products dealer permits to be accompanied by an annual permit fee, etc.
Title
Fees/Tobacco Products Dealer Permits
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. David Simmons [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 3 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (836190) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1037 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S810 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Vetoed by Governor
S694 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S810 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Vetoed by Governor
S694 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology