FL S0808 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing firefighters, law enforcement officers, correctional officers, and correctional probation officers to receive medical treatment by a medical specialist for certain conditions under certain circumstances; requiring firefighters, law enforcement officers, correctional officers, and correctional probation officers to notify certain entities of their selection of a medical specialist, etc.
Title
Treatment by a Medical Specialist
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Nick DiCeglie [R] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
Sen. Rosalind Osgood [D] | Sen. Bobby Powell [D] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#862 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H637 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table