FL S0806 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget; Rules -SJ 285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires approval by the Legislature of any vote taken by the commission which approves an increase in rates charged to customers for electric, natural gas, telecommunications, water, or wastewater service before the vote of the commission takes effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-24 Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget; Rules -SJ 285
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 63
2011-02-09 Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget; Rules -SJ 63
2011-02-03 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0159 () 2011-03-04 - Withdrawn from Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
350129Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback