FL H0159 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Withdrawn from Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Withdrawn from Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires approval by Legislature of any vote taken by commission that approves increase in rates charged to customers for electric, natural gas, telecommunications, water, or wastewater service before vote of commission takes effect.
Title
Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Withdrawn from Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0806 () 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget; Rules -SJ 285
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/159 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0159/BillText/Filed/HTML |