FL S0804 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing criminal penalties for making certain false representations or omissions of material facts when applying for service provider licenses; requiring the Department of Children and Families to suspend a service provider's license under certain circumstances; expanding the applicability of certain exemptions for disqualification to applications for certification of a recovery residence or a recovery residence administrator, respectively; specifying that certain dwellings converted to recovery residences do not have a change of occupancy under the Florida Building Code due to such conversion, etc.
Title
Substance Abuse Services
Sponsors
Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#323 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-128 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/02/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H319 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 804 (Ch. 2021-128)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
397 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4871 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4873 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |