FL S0804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - CS by Judiciary read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Congress to take appropriate actions to assist in the delivery of humanitarian assistance, to continue and intensify financial sanctions against the regime of Nicolăs Maduro and the Government of Venezuela, and to instruct appropriate federal agencies to hold Nicolăs Maduro and officials of the Government of Venezuela accountable for violations of law and abuses of internationally recognized human rights, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humanitarian Assistance/Government of Venezuela

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H205 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - In Messages

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback