FL H0205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requests Congress to urge government of Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela to allow delivery of humanitarian assistance, to continue & intensify financial sanctions against regime of Nicolăs Maduro, & to instruct appropriate Federal agencies to hold regime of Nicolăs Maduro accountable for violations of law & abuses of internationally recognized human rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Venezuela

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateIn Messages
2019-03-20HouseCS adopted
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-11HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-03-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/07/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-08HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-06HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-01-30HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S804 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - CS by Judiciary read 1st time

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback