FL S0794 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 605 (Ch. 2014-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 605 (Ch. 2014-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising criteria for special alcoholic beverage licenses for certain entities operating within the Town of Lady Lake and certain entities operating within Sumter County, etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Licenses, Lake and Sumter Counties
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 605 (Ch. 2014-229) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0605 (Same As) 2014-06-25 - Chapter No. 2014-229
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/794 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0794/BillText/Filed/HTML |