FL S0790 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising written notice requirements relating to the satisfaction of an owner's lien; revising publication requirements relating to advertising the sale or other disposition of self-storage facilities; requiring that rental agreements authorize tenants to designate an optional alternate contact for purposes of providing specified notice, etc.
Title
Self-storage Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H995 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S760 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar
S760 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/790 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/790/BillText/Filed/HTML |