FL S0790 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that certain revenues from service charges collected by the clerk for remittance to the Department of Revenue include only revenues for court-related functions; providing for revenues for county operations to be retained by the clerk; revising the distribution of revenue from filing fees from the institution of certain appellate proceedings; revising retroactive application regarding the collection of revenue for court-related functions for remittance to the department, etc.
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H591 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |