FL S0784 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Truth in Government Act"; deleting provisions regarding the administration of oaths and affirmations to witnesses appearing before legislative committees, and associated penalties, to conform to changes made by the act; requiring that persons addressing a legislative committee take an oath or affirmation of truthfulness; providing criminal penalties for certain false statements before a legislative committee, etc.
Title
Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/784 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/784/BillText/Filed/HTML |