FL S0780 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a company that is on the Scrutinized Companies that Boycott Israel List or that is engaged in a boycott of Israel from bidding on, submitting a proposal for, or entering into or renewing a contract with an agency or local governmental entity for goods or services of any amount; requiring such contracts entered into or renewed on or after July 1, 2018, to include a provision authorizing termination of the contract under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition Against Contracting with Scrutinized Companies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 545
2018-02-28SenateSubstituted HB 545
2018-02-28SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/08/18, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-11-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H545 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-52

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback