FL H0545 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-52
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits company that is on Scrutinized Companies that Boycott Israel List or that is engaged in boycott of Israel from bidding on, submitting proposal for, or entering into or renewing contract with agency or local governmental entity for goods or services; provides exceptions; requires specified provision in such contracts; requires company to make specified certification in specified circumstances; provides for preemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition Against Contracting with Scrutinized Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#565 (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-52
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-01SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1
2018-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-28SenateSubstituted for SB 780
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateReceived
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2018-02-07SenateIn Messages
2018-01-31HousePassed; YEAS 109 NAYS 3
2018-01-31HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 2
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-06HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S780 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 545

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback