FL S0780 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Economic Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting vehicles transporting power mobility devices for use by persons who have a disability from payment of parking fees at a publicly owned or operated airport, etc.
Title
Airport Parking Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Economic Affairs Committee | |
2012-02-24 | Received -HJ 830 | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee -HJ 830 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-14 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-14 | Read 3rd time -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-13 | Read 2nd time -SJ 492 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/12 | |
2012-01-23 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-23 | Favorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-18 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 112 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 106 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 66 | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/12, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 66 | |
2011-11-01 | Filed |