FL S0778 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a local government to enact land development regulations to permit land use for a small-footprint grocery store located in a food insecure area; authorizing a local government to include in its comprehensive plan a provision permitting land use for a small-footprint grocery store located in a food insecure area; authorizing a local government to require mandatory reporting of certain information from a small-footprint grocery store, etc.
Title
Food Insecure Areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Agriculture; Rules |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H727 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/778 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/778/BillText/Filed/HTML |