FL S0778 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting local ordinances and regulations from restricting competition for the award of a contract for construction services based upon certain conditions; requiring a state college, county, municipality, school district, or other political subdivision of the state to make specified disclosures in competitive solicitation documents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Construction Preferences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#268 (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-63
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 95 NAYS 22
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 113
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 9
2015-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (260200)
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-14SenateAmendment(s) adopted (537558)
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-08SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-25SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
2015-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-03-18SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-03-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-17SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2015-03-17SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-06SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-04SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-02-13SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2015-02-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0113 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 778 (Ch. 2015-63)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2550991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287084Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/778
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/569074/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/904154/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/534942/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/847222/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/846162/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/326826/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/484780/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/282678/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/537558/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/509254/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Amendment/260200/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Vote/SenateVote_s0778e1008.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0778/Vote/HouseVote_s0778e2268.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback