FL S0770 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying restrictions on residential loan alternative agreements for the disposition of residential real property; prohibiting a court from enforcing such agreements by certain means; providing that such agreements are void if listing services do not begin within a certain timeframe; specifying penalties and remedies, etc.
Title
Residential Loan Alternative Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#145 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Chapter No. 2023-117 | |
2023-05-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 861 |
2023-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-04-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-28 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H861 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 770 (Ch. 2023-117)