FL S0770 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing community transportation coordinators, in cooperation with the coordinating board, to plan for and use regional fare payment systems under certain circumstances which enhance cross-county mobility for specified purposes for certain persons who are unable to transport themselves or to purchase transportation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Disadvantaged

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-18SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-11-06SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4270155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4270157Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback