FL S0768 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the definitions of the terms "direct supervision" and "present in the office suite"; revising the definition of the term "referral" to remove reference to direct physician supervision and to require compliance with certain Medicare payment and coverage rules, etc.
Title
Referral of Patients by Health Care Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#388 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Chapter No. 2023-251 | |
2023-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H601 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 768 (Ch. 2023-251)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |