FL S0766 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting all aircraft sales or leases, rather than the sales or leases of certain aircraft, from the sales and use tax; defining the term "aircraft", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemption on Aircraft Sales or Leases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2018-01-31SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-17SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-11-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6045 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback