FL H6045 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts all aircraft sales or leases from sales & use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax on the Sale or Lease of an Aircraft

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S766 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback