FL S0758 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Maternal Mortality Prevention Task Force task force to advise the Department of Health and make recommendations; requiring the task force to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Maternal Mortality Prevention Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H519 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/758 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/758/BillText/Filed/HTML |