FL S0754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting motor vehicle repair shops or their employees from offering anything of value to a customer in exchange for making an insurance claim for motor vehicle glass replacement or repair, including offers made through certain persons, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage for Windshield Glass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H323 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/754 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/754/BillText/Filed/HTML |