FL H0323 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits motor vehicle repair shops & employees from offering anything of value to customers in exchange for making insurance claims for motor vehicle glass replacement & repair, including offers made through certain persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage for Windshield Glass

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S754 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559920Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback