FL S0750 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that specie legal tender and electronic currency are legal tender; authorizing that specie legal tender be recognized for certain payments by governmental entities; requiring the Department of Financial Services to establish and administer a bullion depository; providing requirements for security measures and insurance coverage for depositories; providing requirements for establishing electronic currencies, etc.
Title
State Legal Tender and Bullion Depository
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S752 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H697 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H699 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H697 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H699 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/750 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/750/BillText/Filed/HTML |