FL S0744 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain condominium or cooperative associations to post certain signs or symbols on buildings; prohibiting an officer, director, or manager from soliciting, offering to accept, or accepting a kickback for which consideration has not been provided; revising voting requirements relating to alterations and additions to certain common elements or association property; revising provisions relating to required condominium and cooperative association bylaws, etc.
Title
Community Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 653 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (595004) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/28/17, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/19/17, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/28/17, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0653 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
S0294 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)
H6027 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)
S1520 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-122
H7055 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
H1237 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-188, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
S1682 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
S0294 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161), CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)
H6027 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-161, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188)
S1520 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-122
H7055 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1520 (Ch. 2017-122)
H1237 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-188, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
S1682 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1237 (Ch. 2017-188), HB 6027 (Ch. 2017-161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
633 | 2225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |